Trustees DALSTON VICTORY HALL
Charity number: 1171079

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Dennis Ryan | Chair | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Ann Byers | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Gregory Denwood | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Patricia Strong | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen McLeod | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Anthony Finn | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aileen West | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Hudson | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Atkinson | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ann Clark | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN HODGSON | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.