Accounts and annual returns LIGHT OF JOY CHURCH

Charity number: 1173439
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 27 August 2024 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 27 August 2024 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 14 July 2023 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 14 July 2023 75 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 October 2022 181 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 28 October 2022 181 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 November 2021 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 November 2021 213 days late Download Open in new window