Financial history LIGHT OF JOY CHURCH

Charity Number: 1173439
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.61k £19.68k £25.23k £28.07k £24.98k
Total expenditure £18.08k £18.21k £20.79k £23.62k £20.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A