Financial history THE BUS SHELTER MK

Charity number: 1173705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £191.74k £268.40k £210.98k £221.80k £357.02k
Total expenditure £61.70k £300.09k £107.14k £165.44k £275.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £51.66k N/A N/A N/A