Accounts and annual returns THE OTHER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1175165
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1559 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1559 days