Accounts and annual returns LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BEALEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity Number: 510379
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2020 04 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2019 21 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2018 29 June 2019 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2017 09 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2017 Not Required