Financial history LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BEALEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity number: 510379
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2016 30/03/2017 30/03/2018 30/03/2019 30/03/2020
Total gross income £4.76k £4.44k £3.36k £4.57k £1.68k
Total expenditure £1.72k £15.19k £2.14k £4.91k £1.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A