Financial history HARVEST ASSEMBLY

Charity Number: 1177394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 23/11/2019 23/11/2020 23/11/2021 23/11/2022 23/11/2023
Total gross income £12.05k £5.52k £5.10k £3.41k £3.70k
Total expenditure £18.25k £6.27k £1.45k £3.97k £3.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A