Accounts and annual returns THE EDUCATCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1177308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 October 2024 26 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2024 26 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 October 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2023 25 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 October 2022 11 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2022 11 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 October 2021 04 January 2023 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2021 04 January 2023 152 days late
Annual return 05 October 2020 02 January 2023 515 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2020 02 January 2023 515 days late Download Open in new window