Financial history THE EDUCATCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1177308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/10/2020 05/10/2021 05/10/2022 05/10/2023 05/10/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £75.35k £427.10k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £44.50k £388.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A