Governing document JAIN SAMAJ, MANCHESTER

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/09/1980 AS AMENDED ON 13/09/1997 AS AMENDED ON 27/02/1999 AS AMENDED ON 31/03/2012 as amended on 23 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
I. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MANCHESTER INCLUDING THE MEMBERS OF THE SAMAJ (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. II. TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES NOT ONLY IN THE UK BUT ALSO THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. III. TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE JAIN RELIGION AND TO RELIEVE THE FOLLOWERS OF THE JAIN RELIGION WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES. II. TO EDUCATE THE CHILDREN OF MEMBERS IN THE JAIN RELIGION AND ENCOURAGE LEARNING OF LANGUAGES. III. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THEIR RELIGIOUS WORSHIP. IV. TO CELEBRATE RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS FOR THE MEMBERS OF THE SAMAJ AND ORGANISE MEETINGS AND LECTURES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.