Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DAMASCUS
Charity number: 1175551

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev HELEN KENDRICK | Chair | 01 July 2017 |
|
|||||||
Caroline Miller | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Sloggett | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Elaine Maxwell | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Murray | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Budd | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Philip Sutton | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
VALERIE CROSS | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
NICOLA TURNER | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|||||||
ALEXANDRA LANDSBERT | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Professor DAVID KING | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
HH ANTHONY KING | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.