Trustees NOTTINGHAMSHIRE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND
Charity number: 511288

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACKY FISHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shamaila Kauser | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Ellis | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Skill | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Faye Dale | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Stapleton | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Evans | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
LISA JONES | Trustee | 25 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.