Financial history THE BROOKFIELD PARK SHIERS FAMILY TRUST

Charity number: 511754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.21k £6.54k £36.51k £9.39k £12.68k
Total expenditure £20.14k £13.85k £26.63k £0 £4.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A