Accounts and annual returns THE WILLIAM MILLS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 14 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 14 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 21 June 2024 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 21 June 2024 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 09 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 09 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 18 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window