Financial history THE WILLIAM MILLS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £30.99k £3.41k £11.47k £19.96k £5.42k
Total expenditure £10.99k £3.08k £5.12k £9.73k £12.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £750 N/A N/A N/A N/A