Accounts and annual returns THE HUNSTANTON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity number: 1180827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required