Trustees THE HUNSTANTON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)
Charity number: 1180827

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacquie Yaxley | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Young | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Joan Eckersall | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Verity Jane Mitchell | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Dawn Blenkinsop | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Norman David Mitchell | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annette Linda Francis | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Elaine Thompson | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian John Holland | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.