Trustees MANSTON HISTORY MUSEUM

Charity number: 1179982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tom Groombridge Chair 26 October 2020
None on record
Martin Izzard Trustee 15 January 2022
None on record
Wendy Lawrence Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record
Brian Wray Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record
Michael Everall Trustee 10 November 2021
None on record
Jeannene Groombridge Trustee 26 October 2020
None on record
Doug Smith Trustee 09 February 2019
None on record
Dale Howlett Trustee 23 March 2018
None on record
TERENCE BROOKS Trustee 23 March 2018
None on record