Financial history FRIENDS OF NEWBOLD VERDON PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1181066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/08/2019 01/08/2020 01/08/2021 01/08/2022 01/08/2023
Total gross income £6.03k £7.07k £0 £2.18k £5.73k
Total expenditure £4.18k £9.76k £731 £1.19k £4.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A