Governing document CRESCENT ARTS
Charity number: 513099

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MARCH 1981 AS AMENDED 4 AUGUST 1982, 8 SEPTEMBER 1982, 6 OCTOBER 1982, SCHEME OF 27 JANUARY 1989, 22 MAY 1998 AND 4 OCTOBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE AND AN INTEREST, KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF SCARBOROUGH AND BEYOND. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SCARBOROUGH AND BEYOND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.