Accounts and annual returns SIDMOUTH U3A

Charity number: 1183607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 05 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 08 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 08 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 01 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 07 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required