Trustees SIDMOUTH U3A

Charity number: 1183607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lesley Ann Tuck Trustee 11 March 2025
None on record
Gail Lesley Richmond Trustee 11 March 2025
None on record
Angie Hutchings Trustee 13 October 2024
None on record
Francetta Bridle Trustee 09 April 2024
None on record
Kate Ashby Trustee 06 September 2023
None on record
Christopher David Powell Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record
Neil Morley Trustee 14 March 2023
None on record