Accounts and annual returns Family2Family

Charity number: 1185207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 May 2024 10 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 May 2024 10 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 May 2023 12 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 May 2023 12 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 May 2022 14 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 May 2022 14 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 May 2021 15 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 May 2021 15 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 May 2020 30 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 May 2020 30 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window