Financial history Family2Family

Charity number: 1185207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/05/2020 15/05/2021 15/05/2022 15/05/2023 15/05/2024
Total gross income £18.85k £29.39k £21.33k £31.63k £92.36k
Total expenditure £10.94k £27.81k £21.67k £15.84k £55.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A