Accounts and annual returns SOVEREIGN'S PEACE LODGE NO 8911 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 514327
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 September 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 29 September 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2013 27 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 29 September 2012 18 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2012 Not Required