Financial history SOVEREIGN'S PEACE LODGE NO 8911 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 514327
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011 29/09/2012 30/09/2013
Total gross income £2.44k £2.14k £2.24k £2.07k £2.12k
Total expenditure £2.10k £1.06k £1.15k £949 £1.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A