Accounts and annual returns TAVERHAM AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1184127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 22 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 10 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 02 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 04 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 04 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 22 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 22 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 21 May 2021 21 days late Download Open in new window