Financial history TAVERHAM AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1184127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.71k £10.04k £20.41k £17.77k £18.83k
Total expenditure £11.28k £5.90k £15.14k £17.14k £22.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A