Accounts and annual returns THE PAUL AND SHEILA BRADSHAW FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1185701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 14 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 14 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 10 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 10 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 16 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 16 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 20 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 20 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 21 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window