Financial history THE PAUL AND SHEILA BRADSHAW FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1185701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £0 £20.10k £33.06k £81.66k £42.77k
Total expenditure £0 £25.34k £37.65k £85.17k £39.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A