Financial history THE MELTON MOWBRAY TOY SOLDIERS MARCHING DISPLAY BAND

Charity number: 514855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/11/2019 20/11/2020 20/11/2021 20/11/2022 20/11/2023
Total gross income £36.92k £16.58k £14.24k £22.43k £61.45k
Total expenditure £39.30k £12.59k £8.89k £13.98k £17.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.00k N/A N/A