Accounts and annual returns GUJARATI ARYA ASSOCIATION, LEICESTER

Charity number: 515332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 August 2024 287 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 August 2024 287 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 March 2022 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 March 2022 143 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 April 2021 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 April 2021 177 days late Download Open in new window