Financial history SWYTHAMLEY AND HEATON CENTRE

Charity number: 515499
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2007 29/02/2008 28/02/2009 28/02/2010 28/02/2011
Total gross income £8.90k £14.26k £18.53k £10.57k £21.86k
Total expenditure £20.19k £16.25k £18.46k £13.92k £21.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A