Trustees THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF BRIDGNORTH HOSPITAL
Charity Number: 515567

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Tristham | Chair | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Palfrey | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hazel Andrews | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Palfrey | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Atkins | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Brown | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rita Spence | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Davies | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sue Burrows | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Verena Swinnerton | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JUNE MUXWORTHY | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEAN PRIOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH GWENDOLYN MORFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET BRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.