Accounts and annual returns THE ALGERNON EGERTON MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 516679
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 January 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 10 January 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 10 January 2014 31 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 January 2014 Not Required
Annual return 10 January 2013 23 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 January 2013 Not Required
Annual return 10 January 2012 26 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 January 2012 Not Required