Accounts and annual returns WORCESTER ARTS WORKSHOP LIMITED

Charity number: 517183
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2025 359 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 August 2020 On Time