Accounts and annual returns NEW KITTLES COLYTON TRUST

Charity Number: 1192839
Charity reporting is up to date (85 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 January 2025 85 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 October 2023 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 October 2023 350 days late Download Open in new window