Accounts and annual returns CHILDWATCH

Charity number: 518067
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 07 September 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 21 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 22 October 2008 On Time