Trustees STOCKTON-ON-TEES U3A
Charity Number: 518693

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Robert Taylor | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jean Patricia Kirby | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Humpleby | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Reginald Carter | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Clifford Jefferies | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN GRIFFIN | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMES PARKINSON | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.