Financial history HULL HOMELESS AND ROOTLESS PROJECT

Charity number: 519109
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £320.02k £311.94k £344.96k £339.88k £391.04k
Total expenditure £299.52k £309.13k £333.14k £310.16k £339.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A