Accounts and annual returns IVY HOUSE SCHOOL FUND RAISING GROUP

Charity Number: 519113
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 July 2018 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required