Financial history IVY HOUSE SCHOOL FUND RAISING GROUP

Charity number: 519113
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £3.73k £10.81k £35 £1.60k £19.01k
Total expenditure £9.26k £12.26k £384 £377 £2.72k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A