Accounts and annual returns LEEKE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 520467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 18 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 November 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required