Financial history LLANFAIRWATERDINE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £12.85k £18.87k £6.94k £5.95k £5.43k
Total expenditure £3.24k £16.19k £5.27k £6.44k £5.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £17.43k N/A N/A N/A