Trustees LLANFAIRWATERDINE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 522543

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iorwerth Waters | Chair | 03 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
James David McLoughlin | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Thomas | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Wood | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Jane Waters | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wilding | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Kenyon | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
David John Morgan | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mary Bufton | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ann Harroway | Trustee | 01 November 2010 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gibbs | Trustee | 03 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
GILBERT LLEWELYN MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH MARY DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.