Financial history ALREWAS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522598
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/04/2020 21/04/2021 21/04/2022 21/04/2023 21/04/2024
Total gross income £18.81k £20.22k £18.45k £20.00k £19.85k
Total expenditure £19.28k £16.10k £23.40k £18.45k £20.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.00k £3.92k N/A N/A