Trustees ALREWAS VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 522598

Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONY JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gail Adams | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Vernon | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brian Trappett | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Haley | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Harrison | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Williams | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANE GRAVELLS | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DONNA MOSS | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEAN BROWN | Trustee | 10 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.