Governing document THE PROMENADE (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS MERRIONS WOOD)
Charity number: 522741

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 14/01/1924 AND CONVEYANCE DATED 31/12/1940 AS AFFECTED BY SCHEMES DATED 21/11/1987 AND 24/05/1995 AS AMENDED 15/02/2024 as amended on 27 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
BEAUTY SPOT AND PLACE OF PUBLIC PROMENADE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
GREAT BARR AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.