Trustees THE PROMENADE (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS MERRIONS WOOD)

Charity number: 522741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARRY SANDERS Chair 12 October 2012
None on record
Robert Withers Winkle Trustee 19 February 2025
None on record
Councillor Gurmeet Singh Sohal Trustee 08 July 2024
None on record
Heather Allen Trustee 11 July 2023
None on record
SONJA HOWELL Trustee 04 September 2008
None on record